This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 01:20:59 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS MAGANA

Case Summary

On 04/20/2017 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MAGANA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Palmer, William D., Shayer, Steven and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0105

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Palmer, William D.

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendants

MAGANA, LINDA

MAGANA, HERLINDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PIERCE, EMILY

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 08/17/2018: Judicial Officer(s): Shayer, Steven, Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer(s): Benavides, Jose R., Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: continued from 08/17/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV); Party: Names: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; MAGANA, HERLINDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 08/17/2018: Judicial Officer(s): Shayer, Steven, Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer(s): Benavides, Jose R., Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketNotice of Settlement - Conditional

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Served: 05/15/20175:37 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Reduced Filing Fees (Cal. Bus & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less