This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/23/2018 at 05:01:43 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS LLAMAS

Case Summary

On 01/12/2017 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LLAMAS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0037

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

LLAMAS, LUIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRINKERHOFF, KRISTEN LEIGH

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Notice of Settlement Conditional (JBSIS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 12/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: as to Luis LLamas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: RE: Reduced filing fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.