This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 07:16:57 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS KRAMER

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KRAMER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0053

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

KRAMER, RANDALL D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SALET, KERI L.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Randall D Kramer. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 03/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less