This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 02:36:30 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6268

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

HERNANDEZ, ARTURO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COOK, JORDAN D

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Arturo Hernandez, via personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 11/29/20217:28 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: re: Reduced Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC. - JORDAN D. COOK