This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/25/2022 at 14:19:06 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS GUTIERREZ

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GUTIERREZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4524

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

GUTIERREZ, JOEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMS LORI N

 

Court Documents

Complaint

09/22/2022: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

09/22/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

09/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Statement of Classification and Location

09/22/2022: Statement of Classification and Location

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

09/22/2022: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

09/22/2022: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Declaration

10/06/2022: Declaration

Declaration

10/10/2022: Declaration

Request for Dismissal (Entire)

10/17/2022: Request for Dismissal (Entire)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Entire); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: of Non-Service as to Joey Gutierrez, 1 attempt; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: of Non-Service as to Joey Gutierrez, 1 attempt; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Statement of Classification and Location; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant