This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 03:27:24 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS GUERRERO

Case Summary

On 07/14/2014 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GUERRERO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillips, Craig G., Witt, Gary R., Staley, H.A. "Skip" and Staley, H. A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7374

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Phillips, Craig G.

Witt, Gary R.

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

Staley, H. A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

GUERRERO, AUDELIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRINKERHOFF, KRISTEN LEIGH

Attorney at PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

MO-Dismissal: Judicial Officer: Staley, H.A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Dismissed; Comment: Conditional Settlement Filed 6/10/15; Parties Present Plaintiff: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - MO-Dismissal: Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Dismissed; Comment: Conditional Settlement Filed 6/10/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Docket4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • DocketNotice of Settlement - Conditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: RE: PROOF OF SERVICE RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ~ calid=2606496 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4183, CourtDate:01/22/2015, Courtroom:AL, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:GRW, SystemDate:7/15/2014 8:49:14 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: BY PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO AUDELIA GUERRERO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 09, 2015 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 09, 2015 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jan 22, 2015 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jan 22, 2015 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: REGARDING REDUCED FILING FEES (CAL.BUS. & PROF. CODE. 6322.1 (C)(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketStatement - Comment: OF CLASSIFICATION AND LOCATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • Docket843X Pmt: Small Claims First Paper File by Assignee w/in SC - Comment: Amount of $181.00 for PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (PL-1). Received from ABC LEGAL SERVICES, INC., check no(s) 01003244. Receipt #788162 for amount of $181.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less