This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:31:13 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS GARCIA

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GARCIA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0627

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

GARCIA, DARTANIAL D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RITTON, JAIME YOSHIMI

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: Mail to Hunt & Henriques

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Awarded Against: GARCIA, DARTANIAL D; Amount; Damages: $2,298.66; Costs: $240.50; Total: $2539.16; Party: Names: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; GARCIA, DARTANIAL D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketConfidential Document - Comment: MEMO TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: as to Dartanial D. Garcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: REDUCED FILING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less