This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 04:04:17 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS FELIX

Case Summary

On 07/05/2016 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FELIX. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0129

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

FELIX, DELVIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRINKERHOFF, KRISTEN LEIGH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Re: Proof Of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: Re: Proof Of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Without Prejudice As To Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • DocketRenotice of Hearing - Comment: Original Hearing Date: 12/29/16 New Hearing Date: 1/5/17 Re: Local Rule 3.740 (d) Proof Of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned Via ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Regardung Reduced Filling Fees (Cal. Bus. Prof. Code 6322.1 (C)(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less