This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 21:50:46 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS ESPARZA

Case Summary

On 04/14/2016 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ESPARZA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0102

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

ESPARZA, ANTONIO C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HUNT, MICHAEL S

DIPIERO, ANTHONY

HENRIQUES, JANALIE A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV); Party: Names: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; ESPARZA, ANTONIO C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) (After Cond Settlement/Stay) - Comment: With Prejudice, Entire Action, Duly Filed and Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Comment: for Conditional Dismissal Court to retain jurisdiction in the event of defenda'ts default on payments; last payment is due on 10/05/2019. Plaintiff to file a request for dismissal upon completion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Conditional (JBSIS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Settlement Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Served: 05/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.