This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 12:05:27 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS CRATTY

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CRATTY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0565

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

CRATTY, JAMES C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIPIERO, ANTHONY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketWrit Returned Partially Satisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: SACRAMENTO, BY MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA MAIL TO HUNT & HENRIQUES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Awarded Against: CRATTY, JAMES C; Amount; Damages: $3,150.91; Costs: $282.50; Total: $3433.41; Party: Names: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; CRATTY, JAMES C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE 1788.60(A)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Court Entered - Comment: AGAINST PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less