This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/07/2021 at 07:50:11 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS CLARK

Case Summary

On 04/26/2013 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CLARK. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Errea, Larry A.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8792

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Errea, Larry A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

CLARK, ELIZABETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRINKERHOFF, KRISTEN LEIGH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Errea, Larry A.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Errea, Larry A.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES FILED BY PLAINTIFF ~ calid=2239276 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4184, CourtDate:04/04/2014, Courtroom:BS, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:2, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LAE, Deputy:olgam, SystemDate:5/6/2013 11:08:18 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES FILED BY PLAINTIFF ~ calid=2239272 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4183, CourtDate:10/25/2013, Courtroom:BS, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LAE, Deputy:olgam, SystemDate:5/6/2013 11:07:06 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Document Image; WITHOUT PREJUDICE; AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: Document Image; AS TO ELIZABETH CLARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: Document Image; AS TO ELIZABETH CLARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Apr 04, 2014 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Apr 04, 2014 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 25, 2013 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 25, 2013 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • Docket843X Pmt: Small Claims First Paper File by Assignee w/in SC - Comment: Amount of $181.00 for PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (PL-1). Received from ABC LEGAL SERVICES, INC, check no(s) 939395. Receipt #715909 for amount of $181.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 761

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Document Image; RE: REDUCED FILING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristen Brinkerhoff