This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:18:51 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS CASTRO

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CASTRO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6179

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

CASTRO, NORMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HENRIQUES, JANALIE A

Attorney at HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Rd #8

San Jose, CA 951191306

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2013
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: PER ORDER FILED 7/5/13~ calid=2206127 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4184, CourtDate:03/25/2014, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:2, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LSE, Deputy:RYANB, SystemDate:3/29/2013 10:37:02 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2013
  • Order - Comment: ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPUATION FOR JUDGMENT. JURISDICTION RETAINED UNDER CCP 664.6. **COMM. ETIENNE**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • 185C Pmt: Request, App, Stip, Motion, or Notice of - Comment: Amount of $20.00 for PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (PL-1). Received from HUNT & HENRIQUES, check no(s) 388243. Receipt #721647 for amount of $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • 845W Pmt: Ltd Civil First Appearance < $10,000 GC 70614(B) - Comment: Amount of $225.00 for CASTRO, NORMA (DE-1). Received from HUNT & HENRIQUES, check no(s) 388244. Receipt #721646 for amount of $225.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • Agreement - Comment: SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. JURISDICTION RETAINED UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 664.6 FILED BY MICHAE S HUNT, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: 10/8/13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING VACATED, PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ~ calid=2206125 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4183, CourtDate:10/08/2013, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LSE, Deputy:RYANB, SystemDate:3/29/2013 10:36:38 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO NORMA CASTRO SERVED 4/6/13 PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • 843Y Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) - Comment: Amount of $225.00 for PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (PL-1). Received from HUNT & HENRIQUES, check no(s) 368659. Receipt #709889 for amount of $225.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 25, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 25, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 08, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 08, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY JANALIE HENRIQUES, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY JANALIE HENRIQUES, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less