Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/28/2020 at 01:35:47 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS CAMPOS

Case Summary

On 12/05/2012 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CAMPOS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6992

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

CAMPOS, JESUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PIERCE

PIERCE, EMILY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: RE: CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL RE: CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED ~ calid=2248516 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4170, CourtDate:05/01/2014, Courtroom:AL, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:4, SessionType:OSC, Judge:GRW, SystemDate:5/16/2013 9:35:42 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2013
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: DISMISSAL DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: PROOF OF SERVICE PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2013
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL FILED. ~ calid=2106929 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4184, CourtDate:11/21/2013, Courtroom:AL, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:2, SessionType:OSC, Judge:GRW, Deputy:VICKYG, SystemDate:12/7/2012 10:02:11 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2013
  • DocketNotice of Settlement - Conditional - Comment: A REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WILL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 3/15/14.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE FILED 01/04/2013 VG ~ calid=2106926 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4183, CourtDate:05/30/2013, Courtroom:AL, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:GRW, Deputy:VICKYG, SystemDate:12/7/2012 9:59:28 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: AS TO: JESUS CAMPOS FEE: $55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Nov 21, 2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Nov 21, 2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON May 30, 2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON May 30, 2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • Docket843X Pmt: Small Claims First Paper File by Assignee w/in SC - Comment: Amount of $181.00 for PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (PL-1). Received from ABC LEGAL SERVICES , INC., check no(s) 930682. Receipt #690849 for amount of $181.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 775

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: REDUCED FILING FEES (CAL. BUS. & PROF. CODE 6322.0 (C)(1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • DocketStatement - Comment: OF CLASSIFICATION AND LOCATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily Pierce