This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/27/2020 at 13:56:42 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS BRIDGES

Case Summary

On 08/30/2012 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRIDGES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pritchard, Kenneth G.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2090

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendants

BRIDGES, CRISTINE N

BRIDGES, CRISTINE N.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PIERCE

PIERCE, EMILY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV); Party: Names: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; BRIDGES, CRISTINE N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) (After Cond Settlement/Stay)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED ~ calid=2019181 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4184, CourtDate:08/30/2013, Courtroom:AR, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:KP, Deputy:kimha, SystemDate:8/30/2012 3:11:26 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Conditional (JBSIS) - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2012
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: WHAT SERVED:SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ETC. WHO SERVED:CRISTINE N. BRIDGES HOW SERVED:SUB SERVICE TO HALEY BRIDGES, CO RESIDENT, WITH DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE AND BY MAIL DATE SERVED:9/20/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Aug 30, 2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AR OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Aug 30, 2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AR OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • DocketComplaint - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • Docket843Y Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) - Comment: Amount of $225.00 for PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (PL-1). Received from PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, check no(s) 00926644. Receipt #674236 for amount of $225.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 785

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily Pierce