This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 01:20:48 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS AVILA

Case Summary

On 04/20/2017 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AVILA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Palmer, William D., Shayer, Steven and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0104

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Palmer, William D.

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

AVILA, PEDRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMS, LORI N

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer(s): Benavides, Jose R., Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Awarded Against: AVILA, PEDRO; Amount; Damages: $2,088.42; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 0.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $241.00; Other: $0.00; Total: $2329.42; Party: Names: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; AVILA, PEDRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: AS TO DOES 1 TO 25 ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE 1788.60(A)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: (1) COMPLIANCE WITH CCP SECTION 1033(B)(2) 2) WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Reduced Filing Fees (Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.11(c)(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less