This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 16:59:35 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS AVILA

Case Summary

On 02/08/2016 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AVILA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0050

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

AVILA, TARA J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOLONG, ANASTASIA M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: Kern County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketAbstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Kern County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Awarded Against: AVILA, TARA J; Amount; Damages: $1,780.90; Costs: $284.00; Total: $2064.90; Party: Names: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; AVILA, TARA J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: in Support of Application for Entry of Default Judgment Pursuant to Civil Code 1788.60(a)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Interest, Cost, and Attorney Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Served: 03/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.