This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 04:42:39 (UTC).

PORTERVILLE ASPHALT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS CHESTER BROSS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, A MISSOURI CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/14/2016 PORTERVILLE ASPHALT, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHESTER BROSS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, A MISSOURI CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brumfield, Lorna H. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1621

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PORTERVILLE ASPHALT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Porterville Rock & Recycle, Inc.

Defendants

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, A SOUTH DAKOTA CORPORATION

CHESTER BROSS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, A MISSOURI CORPORATION

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, A PUBLIC ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANN, JERRY H

Defendant Attorneys

ARBUTHNOT, TYSON

WONG, JIDI

BAIN, RAIYN

 

Court Documents

Case Status Conference

Case Status Conference 07/27/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: STAY EFFECTIVE SINCE 10/27/2016; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: MANN, JERRY H; Defendant; Attorney: ARBUTHNOT, TYSON; Defendant; Attorney: ARBUTHNOT, TYSON; Defendant; Attorney: BAIN, RAIYN; Plaintiff; Attorney: MANN, JERRY H

Case Status Conference

Case Status Conference 04/26/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: STAY EFFECTIVE SINCE 10/27/2016; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: MANN, JERRY H; Defendant; Attorney: ARBUTHNOT, TYSON; Defendant; Attorney: ARBUTHNOT, TYSON; Defendant; Attorney: BAIN, RAIYN; Plaintiff; Attorney: MANN, JERRY H

Case Status Conference

Case Status Conference 01/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: PENDING ARBITRATION; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: MANN, JERRY H; Defendant; Attorney: ARBUTHNOT, TYSON; Defendant; Attorney: ARBUTHNOT, TYSON; Defendant; Attorney: WONG, JIDI

Case Status Conference

Case Status Conference 04/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: ARBITRATION; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: MANN, JERRY H; Defendant; Attorney: ARBUTHNOT, TYSON; Defendant; Attorney: ARBUTHNOT, TYSON; Defendant; Attorney: WONG, JIDI

Case Management Conference

cmc MO 08/29/2016: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketCase Status Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: STAY EFFECTIVE SINCE 10/27/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Status Conference - Case Status Conference 07/27/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: STAY EFFECTIVE SINCE 10/27/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Status Conference - Case Status Conference 04/26/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: STAY EFFECTIVE SINCE 10/27/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Of Change of Handling Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - cmc MO 08/29/2016: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons on California Department of Transportation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of Case Transfer and Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • DocketNotice of Transfer of Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference - Comment: DATE: 8/29/16 TIME: 8:15 DEPT.:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PORTERVILLE ASPHALT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Served: 09/07/2016; Served: 09/07/2016; Served: 07/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • DocketRecords Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: TRANSFERRED FROM SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF TULARE, SEE ENTRY 2181

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • DocketNotice of Receipt of Record

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.