This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/30/2019 at 07:42:25 (UTC).

POPEJOY VS POPEJOY (B)

Case Summary

On 10/19/2017 POPEJOY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against POPEJOY B. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Loo, Cynthia L., Stainfield, Bryan K., Cannon, Gloria, Benavides, Jose R., McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. and Horrigan, George R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4264

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Loo, Cynthia L.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Cannon, Gloria

Benavides, Jose R.

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

Horrigan, George R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

POPEJOY, ROBIN

Respondent

POPEJOY, JASON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

THOMPSON, MELVIN J

Respondent Attorney

CLOUD, BOBBY L

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RESPONSE AND RESPONSIVE DEC

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 10/02/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: REVIEW PET CC CV PROP CNTRL ATTY FC 3 MINORS CONT'D FROM 11/29/17, 12/18/17, 2/06/18, 3/12/18, 4/18/18, 8/13/18; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J; Respondent; Privately Retained: CLOUD, BOBBY L

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 11/29/2017: Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: 10/19/17 PET C/C C/V C/S S/S PROP CNTRL ATTY F/C 3 MINORS NO SERVICE; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J; Respondent; Privately Retained: CLOUD, BOBBY L

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 08/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: REVIEW PET C/C C/V PROP CNTRL ATTY F/C 3 MINORS CONT 11/29/17 12/18/17 2/6/18 3/12/18 4/18/18; Parties Present Petitioner: POPEJOY, ROBIN; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J; Respondent: POPEJOY, JASON; Privately Retained: CLOUD, BOBBY L

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 09/11/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/08/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR 3 MINORS; Parties Present Respondent; Privately Retained: CLOUD, BOBBY L

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 12/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/08/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR 3 MINORS CONT FROM 09/11/18 10/2/18; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J; Respondent: POPEJOY, JASON; Privately Retained: CLOUD, BOBBY L

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 02/06/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 10/19/17 PET C/C C/V C/S S/S PROP CNTRL ATTY F/C 3 MINORS CONT 11/29/17 12/18/17; Parties Present Petitioner: POPEJOY, ROBIN; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J; Respondent: POPEJOY, JASON; Privately Retained: CLOUD, BOBBY L

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 04/18/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: REVIEW PET C/C C/V PROP CNTRL ATTY F/C 3 MINORS CONT 11/29/17 12/18/17 2/6/18 3/12/18; Parties Present Petitioner: POPEJOY, ROBIN; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J; Respondent: POPEJOY, JASON; Privately Retained: CLOUD, BOBBY L

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 12/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 10/19/17 PET C/C C/V C/S S/S PROP CNTRL ATTY F/C 3 MINORS CONT 11/29/17; Parties Present Petitioner: POPEJOY, ROBIN; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J; Respondent; Privately Retained: CLOUD, BOBBY L

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 3/12/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 10/19/17 PET C/C C/V C/S S/S PROP CNTRL ATTY F/C -REVIEW HEARING 3 MINORS CONT 11/29/17 12/18/17, 2/6/18; Parties Present Petitioner: POPEJOY, ROBIN; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J; Respondent: POPEJOY, JASON; Privately Retained: CLOUD, BOBBY L

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2019
  • Family Centered Case Resolution - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 8/08/18 NOTICE OF HEARING FCCR 3 MINORS CONT'D FROM 9/11/18, 10/02/18, 12/05/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: REVIEW PET CC CV PROP CNTRL ATTY FC 3 MINORS CONT'D FROM 11/29/17, 12/18/17, 2/06/18, 3/12/18, 4/18/18, 8/13/18, 10/02/18, 12/05/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - Family Centered Case Resolution 12/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: REVIEW PET CC CV PROP CNTRL ATTY FC 3 MINORS CONT'D FROM 11/29/17, 12/18/17, 2/06/18, 3/12/18, 4/18/18, 8/13/18 10/2/18; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J; Respondent: POPEJOY, JASON; Privately Retained: CLOUD, BOBBY L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Family Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 12/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/08/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR 3 MINORS CONT FROM 09/11/18 10/2/18; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J; Respondent: POPEJOY, JASON; Privately Retained: CLOUD, BOBBY L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Family Centered Case Resolution - Request for Order - Petitioner 10/02/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/08/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR 3 MINORS CONT FROM 09/11; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J; Respondent; Privately Retained: CLOUD, BOBBY L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 10/02/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: REVIEW PET CC CV PROP CNTRL ATTY FC 3 MINORS CONT'D FROM 11/29/17, 12/18/17, 2/06/18, 3/12/18, 4/18/18, 8/13/18; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: THOMPSON, MELVIN J; Respondent; Privately Retained: CLOUD, BOBBY L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Family Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 09/11/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/08/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR 3 MINORS; Parties Present Respondent; Privately Retained: CLOUD, BOBBY L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Findings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Comment: 03/12/2018 HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2017
  • Video: Putting Children First in a Changing Family - FCS - Comment: Video "Putting children first in a changing family" completed by party on "11/21/2017 01:07".

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Video: Putting Children First in a Changing Family - FCS - Comment: Video "Putting children first in a changing family" completed by party on "11/21/2017 01:07".

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Mediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Mediation; Comment: SET BY MOTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Video: Putting Children First in a Changing Family - FCS - Comment: Video "Putting children first in a changing family" completed by party on "11/14/2017 21:59".

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Video: Putting Children First in a Changing Family - FCS - Comment: Video "Putting children first in a changing family" completed by party on "11/14/2017 21:59".

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Video: Putting Children First in a Changing Family - FCS - Comment: Video "Putting children first in a changing family" completed by party on "11/14/2017 21:59".

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Substitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: IN PRO PER New Attorney:BOBBY L. CLOUD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: HRG 11/29/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.