This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:47:29 (UTC).

POPEJOY VS LAVEAGA, III ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 POPEJOY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LAVEAGA, III. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0714

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POPEJOY, SYDNEE

Defendants

DIAZ, NANNETTE MARIE

LAVEAGA, MARIO ANTONIO, III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLARK, MATTHEW C

Defendant Attorney

LOCKHART, COURTNEY B

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 10/02/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: LOCKHART, COURTNEY B; Defendant; Attorney: LOCKHART, COURTNEY B

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: T/E 4 TO 5 DAYS JURY FOR BOTH SIDES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: J/T & FSC SET 8/20/17 9AM DEPT 11 T/E 4-5 DAYS JURY FOR BOTH SIDES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prejudice signed by Tanya Alsheikh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 10/02/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: AS TO NANNETTE MARIE DIAZ AND MARIO ANTONIO LAVEAGA III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO NANNETTE MARIE DIAZ, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO MARIO ANTONIO LAVEAGA, III, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 04/27/2017; Served: 04/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: Hearing Date: Hearing Time: Hearing Department/Division:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURN VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less