This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:46:27 (UTC).

PONCE VS PONCE

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 PONCE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PONCE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tafoya, Robert S. and Wolf, David E.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0077

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tafoya, Robert S.

Wolf, David E.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PONCE, IMELDA GAMBOA DE

Respondent

PONCE, RUBEN

 

Court Documents

Fee Waiver Review

Fee Waiver Review 04/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: PONCE, IMELDA GAMBOA DE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Granted In Whole - Judicial Officer: Wolf, David E.; Comment: CCP 635

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFee Waiver Review - Fee Waiver Review 04/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketFamily Law Documents - Requested By: PONCE, IMELDA GAMBOA DE; Served: 04/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less