Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 00:17:46 (UTC).

POLLY ANN JOHNSON DECEASED

Case Summary

On 04/06/2017 POLLY ANN JOHNSON DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Bittleston, Dawn, Myers, Brett, Kendall, Andrew, Stein, Cameryn and Friedman - Retired, Gary T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2325

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Bittleston, Dawn

Myers, Brett

Kendall, Andrew

Stein, Cameryn

Friedman - Retired, Gary T.

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Classified By Court

JOHNSON, MICHAEL A

MOSELEY, MICHELLE

Not Classified By Court

JOHNSON, MICHAEL

MOSELEY, MICHELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

PEARL, JOSEPH S

DIXON, ERIN E.

ALEXANDER, WILLIAM L

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

(3) Petition for Letters of Special Administration, Case Management Confer. and Petition 12/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - re: Petition for Probate of Will (Michael Johnson's Petition) 12/28/2017 CALENDAR #1; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: PEARL, JOSEPH S; Attorney: DIXON, ERIN E.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of hearing returned to attorney via AMS outbasket

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Special...returned via attorney out basket

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of hearing returned to attorney via AMS outbasket

Petition

09/21/2017 MO: Petition: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - Petition for Will Contest [Probate code 8250, et seq.] - Michelle Moseley Petition NOTES - 1. Need original summons returned and filed and proof of service per Prob. Code 8250. 2. Need names and address of deceased son's (Tommy Ora Jasmin) heir or beneficiary in paragraph 9.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: PEARL, JOSEPH S

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Summons...returned via AMS

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Creditor's claim reurned to attorney via AMS outbasket

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Creditors claim returned via AMS outbasket

Petition for Probate of Will

Amended MO - Petition for Probate of Will 05/25/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority NOTE - 1. Need proof of mailing.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: PEARL, JOSEPH S

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 11/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING RE WILL CONTEST 11/09/18 CALENDAR #1; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: PEARL, JOSEPH S; Attorney: DIXON, ERIN E.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Motion...returned via file & serve

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Motion x 4...returned via file & serve

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Request for special notice returned to attorney via AMS outbasket

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 05/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - re: petition for probate of will (Michael Johnson's petition) 05/10/18 CALENDAR #1; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: PEARL, JOSEPH S; Attorney: DIXON, ERIN E.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Response and Opposition

Ruling

Ruling 01/31/2018: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Petition for Letters of Special Administration

Petition for Letters of Special Administration 01/25/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Draft Incomplete; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Ex Parte Petition for Appointment of Special Administrator; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: PEARL, JOSEPH S

Petition for Letters of Special Administration

Petition for Letters of Special Administration 01/04/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- re: Ex Parte Petition for Appoinment of Special Administrator; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: PEARL, JOSEPH S

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: compliance hearing re: either a report of status of administrator pursuant to PC 12200 et seq. or petition to close estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Cause set for compliance hearing on May 14, 2020 at 8:30 am in Division P, re: proof of payments for expert fees, Civil attorney fees and costs. Failure to provide proof of payment may subject petitioner to an order for reimbursement. No appearance necessary if documents are on file on or before date May 8, 2020 hearing to be vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: ***EFFECTIVE 4/1/2020, HEARING CONTINUED TO A FUTURE DATE TO BE DETERMINED*** per order dated 11/22/19, Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketOrder for Withdrawal - Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Comment: Order for withdrawal of funds from blocked account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketPetition for Withdrawal of Funds from Blocked Account - Comment: Petition for Withdrawal of Funds from Blocked Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money - Comment: Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: order to show cause in re: dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketLetters of Special Administration - Comment: Michael A Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Order - Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Comment: Order extending/reissuing Letters of special administration and re-calendaring petition for Probate of Will

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Joseph S Pearl in support of Ex parte application for order extending/reissuing Letters of special administration and re-calendaring petition for Probate of Will

    Read MoreRead Less
208 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will - Amended MO - Petition for Probate of Will 05/25/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority NOTE - 1. Need proof of mailing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketObjections - Comment: Objection and will contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of John S. Wall

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: 05/25/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketLetters of Special Administration - Comment: Michael A Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketOrder Appointing Special Administrator - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: Michael A Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Special Administration - Comment: Petition for Letters of Special Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative - Comment: Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketPetition for Probate - Comment: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIXON ERIN ELIZABETH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PEARL, JOSEPH S

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALEXANDER WILLIAM LOUIE