This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:33:36 (UTC).

PMGI FINANCIAL, LLC. VS JULIO SILVA AKA JULIO C. GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 PMGI FINANCIAL, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JULIO SILVA AKA JULIO C GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0318

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PMGI FINANCIAL, LLC.

Defendant

JULIO SILVA AKA JULIO C. GONZALEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENOSIAN, JOHN P

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Kern County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Sacramento County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketAbstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: PMGI FINANCIAL, LLC.; Awarded Against: JULIO SILVA AKA JULIO C. GONZALEZ; Amount; Damages: $2,600.00; Attorney Fees: $490.00; Costs: $246.00; Total: $3336.00; Party: Names: PMGI FINANCIAL, LLC.; JULIO SILVA AKA JULIO C. GONZALEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PMGI FINANCIAL, LLC.; Served: 10/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: In Support of Reduced Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less