This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 02:52:18 (UTC).

PLACKER VS PLACKER

Case Summary

On 06/08/2015 PLACKER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PLACKER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Glennon, Donald P., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0036

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Placker, Deric

Respondent

Placker, Norma

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KOCH, WILLIAM A

 

Court Documents

Confirmation of Special Setting

Confirmation of Special Setting 02/16/2018: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

Court Trial

Court Trial 10/25/17: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: PLACKER, DERIC; Attorney: KOCH, WILLIAM A; Respondent: PLACKER, NORMA

Confirmation of Special Setting

Confirmation of Special Setting 10/24/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

Confirmation of Special Setting

Confirmation of Special Setting 10/23/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further 01/30/17: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: Placker, Deric; Attorney: KOCH, WILLIAM A

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 10/24/2016: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: Placker, Deric; Attorney: KOCH, WILLIAM A; Respondent: Placker, Norma

Request for Order - Petitioner

08/29/16 MO: Request for Order - Petitioner: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

Confirmation of Special Setting

MO: Confirmation of Special Setting: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: KOCH, WILLIAM A

Request for Order - Petitioner

MO 08/17/15: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: Placker, Deric; Attorney: KOCH, WILLIAM A; Respondent: Placker, Norma

Court Trial

Court Trial 02/20/2018: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Trial; Parties Present Petitioner: PLACKER, DERIC; Respondent: PLACKER, NORMA

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR ORDER

Confirmation of Special Setting

Confirmation of Special Setting 07/31/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further 05/15/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: PLACKER, DERIC; Attorney: KOCH, WILLIAM A; Respondent: PLACKER, NORMA

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further 03/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: PLACKER, DERIC; Attorney: KOCH, WILLIAM A; Respondent: PLACKER, NORMA

Request for Order - Petitioner

MO: Petitioner's Request for Order: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: Placker, Deric; Attorney: KOCH, WILLIAM A; Respondent: Placker, Norma

Confirmation of Special Setting

MO: Confirmation of Special Setting: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: KOCH, WILLIAM A

Request for Order - Petitioner

MO 07/27/15: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: Placker, Deric

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial; Party: Names: PLACKER, DERIC; PLACKER, NORMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketJudgment on Reserved Issues - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2015
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • DocketMother Failed to Appear for Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - MO 07/27/15: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • DocketRequest for Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.