This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:53:11 (UTC).

PLACENCIA VS PLACENCIA

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 PLACENCIA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PLACENCIA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schuett, Stephen D. and Stainfield, Bryan K.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1629

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schuett, Stephen D.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PLACENCIA, VICTOR

Respondent

PLACENCIA, ROSA

 

Court Documents

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

FEE WAIVER GRANTED: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW $435; Parties Present Petitioner: PLACENCIA, VICTOR

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2015
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Granted In Whole - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing on Waiver of Fees - FEE WAIVER GRANTED: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW $435; Parties Present Petitioner: PLACENCIA, VICTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • Revenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Judicial Officer: Master, Calendar Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less