This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:45:09 (UTC).

PIONEER PINES MOBILE HOME PARK VS PRISCILLA ALMANZA AKA PRICILA ALMANZA

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 PIONEER PINES MOBILE HOME PARK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PRISCILLA ALMANZA AKA PRICILA ALMANZA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Holladay, Brandon. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1693

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Holladay, Brandon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PIONEER PINES MOBILE HOME PARK

Defendant

PRISCILLA ALMANZA AKA PRICILA ALMANZA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ECHOLS, PAUL E

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) 05/24/2017: Judicial Officer: Holladay, Brandon; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: ANSWER FILED BY PRISCILLA ALMANZA AKA PRICILA ALMANZA. TIME ESTIMATE 30 MINS.; Parties Present Plaintiff: PIONEER PINES MOBILE HOME PARK

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Returned via Attorney Messenger

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: Returned via AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Court Finding After Court Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: PIONEER PINES MOBILE HOME PARK; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 6601 Eucalyptus Dr Spc 292 Bakersfield CA 93306; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: PRISCILLA ALMANZA AKA PRICILA ALMANZA; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $581.27; Holdover Damages: $2,520.00; Attorney Fees: $300.00; Costs: $308.75; Total: $3,710.02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketJudgment after Trial - Judicial Officer: Holladay, Brandon; Comment: Returned via AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) 05/24/2017: Judicial Officer: Holladay, Brandon; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: ANSWER FILED BY PRISCILLA ALMANZA AKA PRICILA ALMANZA. TIME ESTIMATE 30 MINS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketRequest/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: for order for posting and mailing summons and complaint pursuant to CCP 415.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Returned via Attorney Messenger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: for order for posting summons and complaint pursuant to CCP 415.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PIONEER PINES MOBILE HOME PARK; Served: 04/30/201710:50 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 6601 EUCALYPTUS DR. SPC. #292 BAKERSFIELD, CA 93306 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less