This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:39:23 (UTC).

PINEDA VS GRIMMWAY ENTERPRISES, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/26/2015 PINEDA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against GRIMMWAY ENTERPRISES, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Lampe, David R. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1333

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Lampe, David R.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PINEDA, JOSE

Defendant

GRIMMWAY ENTERPRISES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOSS, ARI E

Defendant Attorney

NOVICK, MINDY SUE

 

Court Documents

Motion (Pre-Disposition)

Motion (Pre-Disposition) 01/12/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/11/17 Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement

Case Management Conference

08/30/17 MO: Motion for Preliminary Approval and CMC: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Kelsey Szamet Document: Consolidated Class Action Must identify the complaint properly. Is this an amended complaint, if so please correct.

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 06/08/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

12/13/16 MO: Order to Show Cause re: Consolidation: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Order to Show Cause directed to all parties/counsel in both actions: BCV-15-101333 and BCV-15-101406 (DRL), to show cause why the Court should NOT consolidate the actions for all purposes. (Cont'd from 11/18/2016) ***NOTE: BCV-15-101406 has CMC on 12/14/16 at 8:30 am D11

Further Case Management Conference

**MO w/Declaration of Mailing: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont'd from 06/16/16; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: MOSS, ARI E; Defendant; Attorney: NOVICK, MINDY SUE

Further Case Management Conference

6/16/16 MO: Further Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont'd from 4/25/16; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: MOSS, ARI E; Defendant; Attorney: NOVICK, MINDY SUE

Case Management Conference

4/25/16 MO: Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: MOSS, ARI E; Defendant; Attorney: NOVICK, MINDY SUE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court After Jury Trial (CL/CV); Party: Names: PINEDA, JOSE; GRIMMWAY ENTERPRISES, INC.; Comment: ****SEE JUDGMENT FOR DETAILS****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs; signed by Stephen D Schuett

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Notice of Entry - Comment: NOTICE OF ENTRY IF FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Fees - Pre-Disposition (CL/CV) - Motion (Pre-Disposition) 01/12/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/11/17 Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Attorneys' Fees and Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion (Pre-Disposition) - Motion (Pre-Disposition) 01/12/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/11/17 Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration of Jose Pineda in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service on Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Motion for Final Approval of Attorneys' Fees and Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration of Patrick Hughes for Rust Consulting, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration of Hector Macias In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2016
  • Case Management Statement - Comment: Filed by Mindy S Novick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Grimmway Enterprises, Inc. personal service 11/20/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 2/10/16 Hearing Time: 830 AM Hearing Department/Division: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY ARI E. MOSS, ESQ CMC 4/25/16 @ 8AM D4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.