This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 08:33:30 (UTC).

PINE MOUNTAIN CLUB PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION VS SUITTER

Case Summary

On 08/31/2015 PINE MOUNTAIN CLUB PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SUITTER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0006

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PINE MOUNTAIN CLUB PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendant

SUITTER, KEVIN

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

MO-SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL: Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE FILED; Parties Present Plaintiff: PINE MOUNTAIN CLUB PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION; Defendant: SUITTER, KEVIN

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: Original Returned Via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • DocketCopies Provided as Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Contested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: PINE MOUNTAIN CLUB PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION; Judgment Amount: $500.00; Awarded Against: SUITTER, KEVIN; Party: Names: PINE MOUNTAIN CLUB PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION; SUITTER, KEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - MO-SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL: Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: Rory Worster for PMC Property Owners Assoc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: By Personal Service as to Kevin Suitter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • DocketOrder on Request to Postpone Small Claims Hearings - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • DocketRequest for Postponement of Small Claims Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PINE MOUNTAIN CLUB PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION; Served: 11/23/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less