Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:15:57 (UTC).

PIERCE VS REYNOLDS

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 PIERCE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against REYNOLDS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1325

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PIERCE, TRINA

Defendant

REYNOLDS, WILLIE

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

9/9/15 Minute Order - Small Claims Trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: PIERCE, TRINA

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Uncontested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: PIERCE, TRINA; Awarded Against: REYNOLDS, WILLIE; Amount; Damages: $4,300.00; Costs: $92.50; Total: $4392.50; Party: Names: PIERCE, TRINA; REYNOLDS, WILLIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Writ of Execution Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: KERN/MONEY - RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: KERN/ MONEY/ WES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Trial - 9/9/15 Minute Order - Small Claims Trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: PIERCE, TRINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: SUB SERVICE TO WILLIE REYNOLDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PIERCE, TRINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less