This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 12:13:57 (UTC).

PICHARDO VS RAYGOZA ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 PICHARDO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RAYGOZA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P. and Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2498

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PICHARDO, VICTOR

Defendants

MARIA ELENA MORAN DBA GUARANTEE AUTO SALES

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MORAN, MARIA ELENA

GUADALUPE PELAYO RAYGOZA DBA GUARANTEE AUTO SALES

A-L FINANCIAL CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

RAYGOZA, GUADALUPE PELAYO

Cross Plaintiff

A-L FINANCIAL CORPORATION

Cross Defendants

MARIA ELENA MORAN, AN INDIVIDUAL DBA GUARANTEE AUTO SALES

GUADALUPE PELAYO RAYGOZA, AN INDIVIDUAL DBA GUARANTEE AUTO SALES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Klitzke, Michael A.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

GARDNER, LINCOLN D

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 08/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CRC 3.1385

Ruling

Minute Order: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: TO LINCOLN D GARDNER: E-FILING REJECTION. DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED FOR DEFENDANTS GUADALUPE PELAYO RAYGOZA, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA GUARANTEE AUTO SALES AND MARIA ELENA MORAN, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA GUARANTEE AUTO SALES ON 12/29/16.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/03/17 Hearing Time: 08:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Order to Show Cause re: obtaining default and default judgment pursuant to CRC, rule 3.110 (g) and (h).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: A-L FINANCIAL CORPORATION; Awarded Against: GUADALUPE PELAYO RAYGOZA, AN INDIVIDUAL DBA GUARANTEE AUTO SALES; MARIA ELENA MORAN, AN INDIVIDUAL DBA GUARANTEE AUTO SALES; Amount; Damages: $27,378.13; Attorney Fees: $3,737.81; Costs: $600.41; Total: $31716.35; Party: Names: GUADALUPE PELAYO RAYGOZA, AN INDIVIDUAL DBA GUARANTEE AUTO SALES; MARIA ELENA MORAN, AN INDIVIDUAL DBA GUARANTEE AUTO SALES; A-L FINANCIAL CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: as to Cross-Defendant GUADALUPE PELAYO RAYGOZA dba GUARANTEE AUTO SALES, and MARIA ELENA MORAN individually and dba GUARANTEE AUTO SALES; signed by Sidney P Chapin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default - Comment: Declaration for Entry of Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Request for Dismissal (Partial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment: Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: Default Only as to GUADALUPE PELAYO RAYGOZA, an individual dba GURANTEE AUTO SALES; and MARIA ELENA MORAN, an individual dba GUARANTEE AUTO SALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 08/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketNotice of Assignment / Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: and OSC hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge-170.6 - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Comment: REFER TO RULING 11/02/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 11/06/2016; Served: 11/18/2016; Served: 11/04/2016; Served: 11/04/2016; Served: 11/06/2016; Served: 11/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketStatement - Comment: OF ACTUAL AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/03/17 Hearing Time: 08:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less