This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 23:52:18 (UTC).

PICAZO VS PICAZO

Case Summary

On 04/21/2015 PICAZO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PICAZO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Domnitz, H. Ronald, Fielder, John L., Schuett, Stephen D., Stainfield, Bryan K. and Gill, Susan M.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2197

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Domnitz, H. Ronald

Fielder, John L.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Gill, Susan M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PICAZO, ALMAROSA G.

Respondent

PICAZO, J. REFUGIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RUBIO, NIEVES

Attorney at LAW OFC NIEVES RUBIO

1615 "V" St

Bakersfield, CA 93301

Respondent Attorney

SEIDMAN, MICHAEL L

 

Court Documents

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 10/05/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: PICAZO, ALMAROSA G.; Respondent: PICAZO, J. REFUGIO

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: AT ISSUE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DECLARATION RE SERVICE OF DECLARARION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION

Review

7/7/16 - MO - REVIEW: Judicial Officer: Domnitz, H. Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: REVIEW RESERVED ON S/S CONT FROM 5/19/16; Parties Present Petitioner: PICAZO, ALMAROSA G.; Respondent: PICAZO, J. REFUGIO

Review

05/19/16 MO: REVIEW: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RESERVED ON SS; Parties Present Respondent: PICAZO, J. REFUGIO

Review

04/13/16 MO REVIEW RESERVED SPOUSAL SUPPORT: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: REVIEW RESERVED S/S CONT 01/12/16 02/24/1

Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw

02/23/16 MOTION TO BE RELIEVED / WITHDRAW AS PETITIONER'S COUNSEL OF RECORD: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET NOM TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Review

02/24/16 REVIEW- SUPPORT ISSUES RESERVED: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RESERVED SUPPORT ISSUES CONT 01/12/16

Review

01/12/16 - REVIEW ON RESERVED SUPPORT ISSUES: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RESERVED SUPPORT ISSUE CONTD FROM 10/7/15 & 11/17/15

Review

MO 11/17/15 REVIEW: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RESERVED SUPPORT ISSUE CONT'D FROM 10/07/15

Review

REVIEW M/O: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RESERVED SUPPORT ISSUED CONT'D FROM 9/09/15; Parties Present Petitioner: PICAZO, ALMAROSA G.; Respondent: PICAZO, J. REFUGIO

Review

REVIEW M/O: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: reserved support issued

Request for Order - Petitioner

REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER CHILD CUSTODY, CHILD SUPPORT, SPOUSAL: 6/04/15 HRG: DISSOMASTER: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CHILD CUSTODY, CHILD VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT, SPOUSAL SUPPORT (COUNSEL ONLY) CONT FROM 05/20/15

Request for Order - Petitioner

REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER CHAMBERS CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: COURT TO SPEAK TO MINORS AT 3:00 P.M. * CASE SET FOR 06/04/15; Parties Present Petitioner: PICAZO, ALMAROSA G.; Respondent: PICAZO, J. REFUGIO

Request for Order - Petitioner

REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER CHILD CUSTODY, CHILD VISITATION: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued-Party Motion; Comment: PET C/C/ C/V C/S S/S ATTY F/C 1 MINOR; Parties Present Petitioner: PICAZO, ALMAROSA G.; Respondent: PICAZO, J. REFUGIO

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Comment: SIGNED PURSUANT TO C.C.P 635

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketStipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: E-FILED: STIPULATIONS AND WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Mandatory Settlement Conference 10/05/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • DocketNotice of Mandatory Settlement Conference/Trial Status - Comment: Conference Hearing Date: 10/05/17 Hearing Time: 9:00 AM Department/Division: MC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketAt-Issue Memorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: AT ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2015
  • Docket4999 Mediation Appointment - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: set by Rubio-Mother

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • DocketResponsive Declaration - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: RESP HRG 05/20/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • Docket171F Pmt: Reconciliation Motion GC 70677(A) & 70678 - Comment: Amount of $85.00 for PICAZO, ALMAROSA G. (PE-1). Received from PICAZO, ALMAROSA G., check no(s) 1817. Receipt #835371 for amount of $520.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • Docket805L Pmt: New Suit - Family Law GC 70670(B) (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for PICAZO, ALMAROSA G. (PE-1). Received from PICAZO, ALMAROSA G., check no(s) 1817. Receipt #835371 for amount of $520.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2015
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: PET HRG DATE: 5/20/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.