This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 10/03/2018 at 07:37:29 (UTC).

PHILLIPS VS BAKERSFIELD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/17/2017 PHILLIPS filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against BAKERSFIELD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1616

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PHILLIPS, ERIC

PHILLIPS

Defendants

RUCKER, BURNETT, M.D.

BORNSTEIN, ISAAC MICHAEL, M.D.

HOLLIE, NORRIS, M.D.

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

KRISHAN, RAJEEV, M.D.

BAKERSFIELD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

KWAIFA KARY MACK, N.P.

ISAAC M. BORNSTEIN, M.D.

MANAGEMENT AND TRAINING CORPORATION (MTC MEDICAL)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW, PATRICIA A.

Defendant Attorneys

GRUENBERG, KRISTINA D

MISH, ALAN J

OSBORN, PATRICK J

HAYDEN-LAMBIRTH, DENA

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/30/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 01/16/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: AS TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA & NORRIS HOLLIE, M.D.; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: LAW, PATRICIA A.; Defendant; Attorney: OSBORN, PATRICK J; Defendant; Attorney: MISH, ALAN J; Defendant; Attorney: GRUENBERG, KRISTINA D; Defendant; Attorney: GRUENBERG, KRISTINA D; Defendant; Attorney: GRUENBERG, KRISTINA D; Defendant; Attorney: HAYDEN-LAMBIRTH, DENA

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Missing page 2 of 2 of request for dismissal. Returned via efile

Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw (Pre-Disposition)

Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw (Pre-Disposition) 07/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 6/8/18 Plaintiff, ERIC PHILLIPS Motion to be Relieved as Counsel ResID: 31095

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Patricia Law Re: Proof of service as to defendant Management and training Corporation (MTC Medical) Reason: # 3 is a two part section. Your document is missing 3(b). "Legal Department" mentioned under party served is not sufficient information. Service on a corporation must be in accordance to ccp 416.10(b) to the president, chief executive officer, or other head of the corporation, a vice president, a secretary of assistant secretary, a treasurer, a controller or chief financial officer, a general manager or a person authorized by the corporation to receive service of process

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 03/01/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 01/16/2018; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: LAW, PATRICIA A.; Defendant; Attorney: OSBORN, PATRICK J; Defendant; Attorney: MISH, ALAN J; Defendant; Attorney: GRUENBERG, KRISTINA D; Defendant; Attorney: GRUENBERG, KRISTINA D; Defendant; Attorney: GRUENBERG, KRISTINA D; Defendant; Attorney: HAYDEN-LAMBIRTH, DENA; Defendant; Attorney: GRUENBERG, KRISTINA D

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. Fees were not included. Please resubmit document with appropriate fees.

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 9-18-17: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Case Management Statement rejected in File and Serve

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Jury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: & final case management conference set con-current. estimate 10 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With prejudice as to entire action of all parties and all causes of action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Electronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Missing page 2 of 2 of request for dismissal. Returned via efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Proof of Service of Order After Hearing by Mail (SV-260) - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw (Pre-Disposition) - Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw (Pre-Disposition) 07/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 6/8/18 Plaintiff, ERIC PHILLIPS Motion to be Relieved as Counsel ResID: 31095

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: in support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Notice of Motion - Comment: Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Hearing Date: 7/9/18 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 17

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2017
  • Answer to Complaint - Comment: AS TO RAJEEV KRISHAN, M.D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Answer to Complaint - Comment: AS TO ISAAC M. BORNSTEIN, M.D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/30/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.