Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/25/2020 at 22:23:59 (UTC).

PETRICIA MURUSICH TRUST, JOHN SABOVICH, MANAGER VS GUTIERREZ ETL.

Case Summary

On 04/20/2012 PETRICIA MURUSICH TRUST, JOHN SABOVICH, MANAGER filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GUTIERREZ ETL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6844

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PETRICIA MURUSICH TRUST

Defendants

GUTIERREZ, JEFFERY

GUTIERREZ, GLORIA

GUTIERREZ, FREDDIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2012
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: RE: DISMISSAL RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2012
  • DocketNP1500 - Comment: Department: AL Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. ELECTRONIC RECORDING NUMBER(S):051712/1359. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: PETRICIA MURUSICH TRUST (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. FREDDIE GUTIERREZ (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. ROBERT LUCERO PRESENT AND DULY SWORN AS SPANISH INTERPRETER FOR FREDDIE GUTIERREZ (DE-1). GLORIA GUTIERREZ (DE-2) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. JEFFERY GUTIERREZ (DE-3) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. JOHN SABOVICH DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF. GLORIA GUTIERREZ (DE-2) DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON OWN BEHALF. FREDDIE GUTIERREZ (DE-1) DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON OWN BEHALF. JEFFERY GUTIERREZ (DE-3) DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON OWN BEHALF. EVIDENCE SUBMITTED TO THE COURT FOR RULING. JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF, AGAINST DEFENDANTS, RENT/RENTAL DAMAGES $0, COSTS $0, ATTORNEY FEES $0, MISC FEES $0 FOR A TOTAL OF $0. RESTITUTION OF PREMISES. WRIT OF POSSESSION TO ISSUE. FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT. WRIT OF POSSESSION WILL ISSUE IMMEDIATELY, BUT THERE SHALL BE NO LOCKOUT BEFORE 12:00PM ON 06/01/12. DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, AFTER EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2012
  • Docket4151 Unlawful Detainer Trial - (N6a) - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: ANSWER FILED BY: JEFFERY GUTIERREZ DATE: 04/27/12 ANSWER FILED BY: GLORIA GUTIERREZ & FREDDIE GUTIERREZ ON 5/9/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2012
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court); Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: CONV; Comment: ANSWER FILED BY: JEFFERY GUTIERREZ DATE: 04/27/12 ANSWER FILED BY: GLORIA GUTIERREZ & FREDDIE GUTIERREZ ON 5/9/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2012
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: TRIAL SET ~ calid=1900348 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4191, CourtDate:07/19/2012, Courtroom:AL, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:GRW, Deputy:amandaa, SystemDate:4/20/2012 12:22:45 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • DocketRequest/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD) - Comment: AS TO: FREDDIE GUTIERREZ & GLORIA GUTIERREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • DocketNotice of Trial - Comment: NOTICE OF TRIAL CAUSE SET FOR TRIAL ON 5/17/2012 AT 1:30PM IN DEPARTMENT AL, 12022 MAIN STREET, LAMONT, CA 93241, OF THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF KERN. THE CASE WILL BE CALLED PROMPTLY AT THE SCHEDULED TIME. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF TRIAL CAUSE SET FOR TRIAL ON 5/17/2012 AT 1:30PM IN DEPARTMENT AL, 12022 MAIN STREET, LAMONT, CA 93241, OF THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF KERN. THE CASE WILL BE CALLED PROMPTLY AT THE SCHEDULED TIME.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2012
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: AS TO: FREDDIE GUTIERREZ SIGNED BY: JUDGE GARY R. WITT DATE: 5/11/2012 MAILED: 5/14/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: AS TO: GLORIA GUTIERREZ SIGNED BY: JUDGE GARY R. WITT DATE: 5/10/2012 MAILED: 5/14/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: FILED BY: GLORIA GUTIERREZ DATE: 5/9/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2012
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: WHAT SERVED: ANSWER-UNLAWFUL WHO SERVED: JOHN SABOVICH,-PETRICIA MURUSICH TRUST HOW SERVED: BY MAIL DATE SERVED: 04/26/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: POS-010 REJECTED: REASON MIGUEL GUTIERREZ IS NOT LISTED AS A DEFENDANT ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT WHO SERVED: JEFFERY GUTIERREZ HOW SERVED: PERSONAL SERVICE DATE SERVED: 04/22/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS, COMPLIANT WHO SERVED: GLORIA GUTIERREZ HOW SERVED: SUBSITITUTED SERVICE, BY SERVING JEFFERY GUTIERREZ DATE SERVED: 04/22/12 MAILED THEREAFTER ON 04/24/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT WHO SERVED: FREDDIE DURATE GUTIERREZ HOW SERVED: SUBSTITUTED SERVICE, BY SERVING JEFFERY GUTIERREZ DATE SERVED: 04/22/12 MAILED THEREAFTER ON 04/24/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. ______________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 629 MAIN STREET, DELANO, CA 93215. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. ______________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 629 MAIN STREET, DELANO, CA 93215.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.15.1(c) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Jul 19, 2012 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ GARY R WITT Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Jul 19, 2012 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ GARY R WITT Judge of the Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • Docket841J Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee <$10,000 GC 70613(B); - Comment: Amount of $240.00 for PETRICIA MURUSICH TRUST (PL-1). Received from JOHN SABOVICH. Receipt #650667 for amount of $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 431

    Read MoreRead Less