This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/15/2023 at 11:35:47 (UTC).

PETERSON VS THE KROGER CO. ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 PETERSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE KROGER CO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1622

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PETERSON, EDDIE

Defendants

DOE, JOHN

FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN MICHAEL P

Defendant Attorney

STONE GREGORY E

 

Court Documents

Complaint

06/28/2022: Complaint

Further Case Management Conference

01/04/2023: Further Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference

01/03/2023: Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

10/19/2022: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Notice of Motion

12/22/2022: Notice of Motion

Case Management Statement

12/20/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

12/19/2022: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

12/19/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice

12/09/2022: Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice

12/08/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Notice of Motion

12/06/2022: Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion

12/06/2022: Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion

12/06/2022: Notice of Motion

Answer to Complaint

08/24/2022: Answer to Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

08/08/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Order to Show Cause

07/06/2022: Order to Show Cause

Summons Issued and Filed

07/06/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

06/28/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/17/2023

HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Dept.: Bakersfield Division J

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

HearingHearing Type: Motion to Compel; Dept.: Bakersfield Division J

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

HearingHearing Type: Motion to Compel; Dept.: Bakersfield Division J

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

HearingHearing Type: Motion to Compel; Dept.: Bakersfield Division J

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

HearingHearing Type: Further Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division J

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023
View Court Documents

HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Dept.: Bakersfield Division J; Result: Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023
View Court Documents

HearingHearing Type: Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw (Pre-Disposition); Dept.: Bakersfield Division J; Result: Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023
View Court Documents

HearingHearing Type: Further Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division J; Result: Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2023
View Court Documents

HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Dept.: Bakersfield Division J; Result: Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2023
View Court Documents

HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division J; Result: Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
12/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Notice of Motion; Comment: MOTION OFFOOD 4 LESS TO COMPELRESPONSES AND PRODUCTION TOREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OFDOCUMENTS;REQUEST FORSANCTIONS; Filed By: DEFENDANT - FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Notice of Motion; Comment: MOTION OFFOOD 4 LESS TO COMPELRESPONSES TO SPECIALINTERROGATORIES;; Filed By: DEFENDANT - FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Notice of Motion; Comment: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF FOOD 4 LESS TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; AND DECLARATION OF TATIANA KARAMIAN; Filed By: DEFENDANT - FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2022
View Court Documents

HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Dept.: Bakersfield Division J; Result: Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Filed By: DEFENDANT - FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to The Kroger Co., via personal service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 10/19/2022Hearing Time: 8:30amHearing Department/Division: J

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PETERSON, EDDIE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PETERSON, EDDIE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - PETERSON, EDDIE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less