This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:45:58 (UTC).

PETER WHITNEY WHITWORTH DECEASED

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 PETER WHITNEY WHITWORTH DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bittleston, Dawn, Knight, Alisa R. and Myers, Brett. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3027

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bittleston, Dawn

Knight, Alisa R.

Myers, Brett

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WHITWORTH, THOMAS E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GELBER, JAMIE P

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Supplement

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 02/01/2018: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING re: Status Report of Administrator pursuant to PC 12200 NOTE- 1. As of 1/09/18, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close estate has not been submitted for filing.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: GELBER, JAMIE P

Petition for Letters

Petition for Letters 01/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING SAME NOTE - 1. Need waiver of bond on mandatory Judicial Council form "Waiver of Bond By Heir" (form DE-142) NEW NOTE - 2. Proof of Publication filed by fax on 01/19/17. Need original Proof of Publication.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: GELBER, JAMIE P

Petition for Letters

MO PETITION FOR LETTERS: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Trial; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTES - 1. Need waiver of bond on mandatory Judicial Council form "Waiver of Bond By Heir" (form DE-142) 2. Need proof of publication.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: GELBER, JAMIE P

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proof of publication, waiver of bond forms.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2018
  • Compliance Hearing - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Comment: re: Status Report of Administrator pursuant to PC 12200

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Compliance Hearing - Compliance Hearing 02/01/2018: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING re: Status Report of Administrator pursuant to PC 12200 NOTE- 1. As of 1/09/18, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close estate has not been submitted for filing.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: GELBER, JAMIE P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Inventory with Property Tax Certificate - Comment: final $229,843.62

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • Notice to Creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • Notice to Creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Letters of Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • Order For Probate - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters - Petition for Letters 01/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING SAME NOTE - 1. Need waiver of bond on mandatory Judicial Council form "Waiver of Bond By Heir" (form DE-142) NEW NOTE - 2. Proof of Publication filed by fax on 01/19/17. Need original Proof of Publication.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: GELBER, JAMIE P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Supplement - Comment: Petition for Letters of Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Proof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2016
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Letters of Special Administration - Comment: Thomas E Whitworth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Order Appointing Special Administrator - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: Thomas E Whitworth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • Petition for Letters of Special Administration - Comment: Petition for Letters of Special Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration in support of Ex Parte hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • Ex Parte Application / Petition - Comment: Application for Ex Parte hearing on Petition for appointment of Special Administrator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative - Comment: Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • Petition for Letters of Administration - Comment: Petition for Letters of Administration Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Petition for letters...returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less