This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 21:38:04 (UTC).

PESANTEZ VS DOE, ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/28/2016 PESANTEZ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DOE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0075

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PESANTEZ, PAUL

Defendants

MCGRATH, MISTY MAY ARLENE

DOE, JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DURINGER, STEPHEN C

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

MO-UD TRIAL: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Defendant: MCGRATH, MISTY MAY ARLENE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial; Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: PESANTEZ, PAUL; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 233 N. Fairview St. Ridgecrest, CA 93555 County of Kern; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: DOE, JOHN; MCGRATH, MISTY MAY ARLENE; Must Pay; Costs: $360.00; Total: $360.00; Party: Names: PESANTEZ, PAUL; DOE, JOHN; MCGRATH, MISTY MAY ARLENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • Writ Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • Writ of Possession Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution Possession or - Comment: Sale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • Judgment after Trial - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Exhibit(s) List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - MO-UD TRIAL: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Defendant: MCGRATH, MISTY MAY ARLENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Notice of Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Request/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default Entered - Comment: John Doe; All Occupants in Care of Named Tenant

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2016
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PESANTEZ, PAUL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.