This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:40:23 (UTC).

PERSOLVE, LLC VS EATON

Case Summary

On 10/11/2017 PERSOLVE, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EATON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Webster, Jason W. and Pritchard, Kenneth G.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0231

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Webster, Jason W.

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERSOLVE, LLC

Defendant

EATON, MATTHEW T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SABAWI, NADER SAMIR

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 04/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement - Conditional - Comment: HRG 9/21/2018 Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 04/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketApplication and Order for Publication of Summons - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less