Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 20:12:59 (UTC).

PERLE VS LOS PADRES ESTATES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION; AN UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 11/04/2019 PERLE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against LOS PADRES ESTATES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION AN UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3119

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERLE, TRACY

Defendant

LOS PADRES ESTATES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION; AN UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHULAK, MICHAEL T

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re:3.110 Hearing Date: 2/18/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:11

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Continued from 05/04/2020 by Standing Order; CONT'D FROM 2/18/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Continued from 05/04/2020 by Standing Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 02/18/2020: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re:3.110 Hearing Date: 2/18/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOS PADRES ESTATES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, AN UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHULAK MICHAEL T.