Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 19:32:52 (UTC).

PERLE VS LOS PADRES ESTATES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 03/11/2016 PERLE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against LOS PADRES ESTATES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brumfield, Lorna H., Clark, Thomas S. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0548

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Clark, Thomas S.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERLE, TRACY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LOS PADRES ESTATES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

LOS PADRES ESTATES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION

Cross Defendants

WENTLAND, ALONNA D.

BARRETT, RUTH

BIENENFELD, MILTON

MEAD, CHANDRA SARGENT

WENTLAND, STEVEN J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LETTENMAIER, ARTHUR J.

CHULAK, MICHAEL T

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

WELLS, DAVID J

OLSON, SONALI

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Request for Dismissal rejected in File and Serve

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING AND MOTION TO COMPEL - FILED BUT NOT CALENDARED. NO RESERVATION NUMBER PER LOCAL RULE 3.3.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: STIPULATION AND ORDER; MISSING FIRST APPEARANCE FEES OF $435. MISSING A DESIGNATED AREA FOR THE JUDICIAL OFFICERS SIGNATURE.

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 04/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Department Transfer

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ANSWER: PROOF OF SERVICE MISSING.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DOCUMENT MUST CONFORM TO CRC 2.111 AS TO FORMAT.

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 03/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 01/20/2017

Further Case Management Conference

**MO - cmc Public: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 11/21/2016

Further Case Management Conference

**MO - cmc Public: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: (Cont'd from 09/26/2016); Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: WELLS, DAVID J

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 09/26/2016: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: LETTENMAIER, ARTHUR J.; Defendant; Attorney: WELLS, DAVID J

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

osc sanctions mo 08/08/2016: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO APPEAR ON 07/08/2016

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

**MO w/Declaration of Mailing 3.110 MO: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With Prejudice on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: estimate 5-6 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: estimate 5-6 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: FCMC 03/02/18; JURY TRIAL 03/12/18; T/E 5-6 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Without Prejudice on Compalint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without Prejudice on Cross-Complaint filed by Los Padres Estates Property Owners Association filed on 11-2-16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Request for Dismissal rejected in File and Serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice Taking Motion off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING AND MOTION TO COMPEL - FILED BUT NOT CALENDARED. NO RESERVATION NUMBER PER LOCAL RULE 3.3.

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FTA ON 07/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - osc sanctions mo 08/08/2016: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO APPEAR ON 07/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 06/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO LOS PADRES ESTATES PROPERETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - **MO w/Declaration of Mailing 3.110 MO: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 6/28/16 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOS PADRES ESTATES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, AN UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WELLS, DAVID J