This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:44:46 (UTC).

PEREZ VS SOLIS (C)

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 PEREZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SOLIS C. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fielder, John L., Stainfield, Bryan K. and Gill, Susan M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4593

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fielder, John L.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Gill, Susan M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PEREZ, VERONICA

Respondent

SOLIS, JOSE LUIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HORRIGAN, GEORGE R

Respondent Attorney

LEON, DAVID F

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Petitioner

11/29/16 MO REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET C/C C/V C/S 1 MINOR; Parties Present Petitioner: PEREZ, VERONICA

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDER

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 01/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/27/17 NOTICE OF HEARING FCCR; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R; Respondent; Attorney: LEON, DAVID F

Fee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees

Fee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees 10/13/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW (RECONSIDERATION) FEES: $520.00

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 10/17/2017: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 08/24/17 RES MOD C/C C/V 1 MINOR **STIP CONTINUED FROM 10/2/17**; Parties Present Petitioner: PEREZ, VERONICA; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R; Respondent: SOLIS, JOSE LUIS; Attorney: LEON, DAVID F

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2018
  • Family Centered Case Resolution - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: CONTD FROM 01/10/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Findings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Comment: HRG 10/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: CONT 11/30/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Family Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 01/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/27/17 NOTICE OF HEARING FCCR; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R; Respondent; Attorney: LEON, DAVID F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: HRG 1/10/18 DIV C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Stipulation to Continue and Order - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Comment: CONT'D TO 1/18/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Stipulated Continuance; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R; Respondent; Attorney: LEON, DAVID F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER RECONSIDERATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Order on Fee Waiver After Reconsideration - Ended - 10 Days - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Comment: TOTAL FEES DUE: $520.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference/Trial Status - Comment: Conference Hearing Date: 11/30/17 Hearing Time: 9:00 AM Department/Division: MC

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2016
  • Mediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Mediation; Comment: SET BY MOTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: HRG 11/29/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Video: Putting Children First in a Changing Family - FCS - Comment: Video 'FL-2' completed by party on 10/20/2016 14:17:24.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Void: Entered in Error - Comment: Video 'TEST-1' completed by party on 10/20/2016 14:16:49.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Video: Putting Children First in a Changing Family - FCS - Comment: Video 'MED-1' completed by party on 10/20/2016 14:14:51.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less