Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 23:32:48 (UTC).

PEREZ VS PEREZ (D)

Case Summary

On 04/15/2015 PEREZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PEREZ D. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Benavides, Jose R., Schuett, Stephen D., Fielder, John L., Camacho, Marcos R. and Louie, Chad A.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2096

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Benavides, Jose R.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Fielder, John L.

Camacho, Marcos R.

Louie, Chad A.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PEREZ, JOSE

Respondent

PEREZ, PRISCILLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GARCIA, XOCHITL M

Respondent Attorney

CLOUD, BOBBY L

 

Court Documents

Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw

Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw 01/06/2020: Judicial Officer: Louie, Chad A.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 11/20/19 RES NOM TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Request for Order - Respondent

Long Cause Hearing 10/11/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 3/1/19 RES MOD S/S ATTY F/C OMITTED ASSET CONT'D FROM 4/30/19 *1

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 09/03/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 3/01/19 RES MOD SS ATTY F/C OMITTED ASSET ~09/03 8:30 A.M. STATUS~ ***LONG CAUSE HEARING: 9/03 @ 1:30*** CONT'D FROM 8/06/2019, 8/26/19

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 08/30/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 3/01/19 RES MOD SS ATTY F/C OMITTED ASSET ***LONG CAUSE HEARING: 9/03 @ 1:30*** CONT'D FROM 8/06/2019, 8/26/19 ***STATUS ONLY***

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 08/26/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 3/01/19 RES MOD SS ATTY F/C OMITTED ASSET ***LONG CAUSE HEARING: 9/03 @ 1:30*** CONT'D FROM 8/06/2019 ***STATUS***

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 08/06/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 3/1/19 RES MOD S/S ATTY F/C OMITTED ASSET ***LONG CAUSE HEARING: 9/03 @ 1:30*** *2

Long Cause Hearing

Long Cause Hearing 04/30/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 3/1/19 RES MOD S/S ATTY F/C OMITTED ASSET; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: GARCIA, XOCHITL M; Respondent; Attorney: CLOUD, BOBBY L

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 04/03/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 3/1/19 RES MOD S/S ATTY F/C OMITTED ASSET 16COURT+5CAL--16COURT+3CAL; Parties Present Petitioner: PEREZ, JOSE; Respondent: PEREZ, PRISCILLA; Attorney: CLOUD, BOBBY L

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Court Trial

1/17/17 MO - COURT TRIAL: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: PEREZ, JOSE

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 11/03/2016: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: PEREZ, JOSE

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 09/02/2016: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET TO TAKE DEFAULT FOR NONCOMPLIANCE OF PDD; Parties Present Petitioner: PEREZ, JOSE

Request for Order - Petitioner

05/25/2016 MO: REQUEST FOR ORDER- PETITIONER: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET WAIVE PDD/STRIKE RESPONSE; Parties Present Petitioner: PEREZ, JOSE; Respondent: PEREZ, PRISCILLA

Request for Order - Petitioner

**MO - Public 2/10/2016 PET COMPEL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET COMPEL RESP TO COMPLETE PDD; Parties Present Petitioner: PEREZ, JOSE; Respondent: PEREZ, PRISCILLA

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Hearing on Fee Waiver - Priscilla Perez: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES FW $435.00; Parties Present Respondent: PEREZ, PRISCILLA

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Judicial Officer: Louie, Chad A.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: 3/1/19 RES MOD S/S ATTY F/C OMITTED ASSET CONT'D FROM 4/30/19, 9/03/19, 10/11/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Louie, Chad A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase Status Conference - Judicial Officer: Louie, Chad A.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: CASE STATUS CONFERENCE SET FROM 10/11/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Judicial Officer: Louie, Chad A.; Comment: BOBBY L CLOUD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to be Relieved / Withdraw - Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw 01/06/2020: Judicial Officer: Louie, Chad A.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 11/20/19 RES NOM TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: Re: NOM TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL Hearing Date:1/6/20 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Long Cause Hearing 10/11/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 3/1/19 RES MOD S/S ATTY F/C OMITTED ASSET CONT'D FROM 4/30/19 *1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketTrial Brief - Comment: HRG 10/11/19 DIV D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: HRG 10/11/19 DIV D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration - Comment: HRG 10/11/19 DIV D

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing on Waiver of Fees - Hearing on Fee Waiver - Priscilla Perez: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES FW $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • DocketRevenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • DocketResponse - Comment: RES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Comment: RE HRG 6/5/15 DV MC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: RE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: PE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • Docket805L Pmt: New Suit - Family Law GC 70670(B) (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for PEREZ, JOSE (PE-1). Received from PEREZ, JOSE, check no(s) 47881575. Receipt #834041 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLOUD, BOBBY L