This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/10/2021 at 12:36:49 (UTC).

PEREZ ET AL VS WAL-MART ASSOCIATES, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/10/2020 PEREZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WAL-MART ASSOCIATES, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schuett, Stephen D., Lampe, David R. and Friedman - Retired, Gary T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2114

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schuett, Stephen D.

Lampe, David R.

Friedman - Retired, Gary T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PEREZ, ENRIQUE

PEREZ, KIMBERLY

Defendants

WAL-MART ASSOCIATES, INC.

COTTON, RACHEL

WALMART INC.

DAVIS, PARKER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RODRIGUEZ, DANIEL

WHITTINGTON, MARK JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

COLBERT, MICHAEL F.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 03/08/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM; Result: Held

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/24/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 10

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: T/E 5-7 DAYS JURY FOR PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Comment: J/T & FSC SET 6/27/22 9AM DEPT 11 T/E 5-7 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint - Comment: DOE 1 named as - PARKER DAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 03/08/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: Plaintiffs' Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Hrg: 3/8/21 @ 9:15 am in Dept. 11 - Joseph Whittington to appear by ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketAnswer to First Amended Complaint - Comment: Answer to First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Rachel Cotton. Sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: First Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Wal-Mart Associates Inc. Personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 09/11/2020; Served: 09/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/24/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., a Delaware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLBERT MICHAEL