Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/23/2021 at 09:14:57 (UTC).

PERALTA VS VEGA ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 PERALTA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against VEGA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0912

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PERALTA, ILIANA

PERALTA

Defendants

VEGA, MONICA

VEGA, MARIO ALBERTO

VEGA, DALIA

VEGA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YAGHOUBZADEH, JOSHUA E

Defendant Attorneys

ANDRADE, ALVIN

BERNHARDT, VICTORIA RENAY

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 12/29/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 8/11/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: & final case management conference set con-current. estimate 7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Comment: FCMC/Jury Trial 08/23/2021 (D17) Time Estimate 7 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Previous Attorney: Alvin Andrade New Attorney: Victoria R. Bernhardt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Previous Attorney: Alvin Andrade New Attorney: Victoria R. Bernhardt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Previous Attorney: Alvin Andrade New Attorney: Victoria R. Bernhardt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 12/29/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Case Management Conference 10/26/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Dalia Vega via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Monica Vega via sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Mario Alberto Vega via sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 06/27/20201:40 PM; Served: 06/27/20201:40 PM; Served: 06/27/20201:40 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 8/11/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VEGA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YAGHOUBZADEH, JOSHUA E