This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 01:16:03 (UTC).

PELAYO VS PLASCENCIA

Case Summary

On 04/20/2017 PELAYO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PLASCENCIA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Camacho, Marcos R., Pulskamp, Gregory, Shayer, Steven and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0076

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Camacho, Marcos R.

Pulskamp, Gregory

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PELAYO, ALMA E

Respondent

PLASCENCIA, DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: JUDGMENT FL-180**MAILED 03/24/2020 PER COURT CLOSURES**

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: JUDGMENT FL-180 **RETURNED VIA MAIL**

Court Trial

Court Trial 10/18/2019: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment

Court Trial

Court Trial 09/06/2019: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Stipulated Continuance; Comment: RE: CHILD SUPPORT

Court Trial

Court Trial 07/05/2019: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment

Court Trial

Court Trial 06/21/2019: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Trial

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 04/26/2019: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 03/29/2019: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 11/30/2018: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: OTHER: MOTION TO COMPELL AND SANCTIONS FLC-2107

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: NOTICE OF DEMAND TO PRODUCE VALID PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE (FAMILY CODE SECTION 2107)

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RETURNED TO FL THOMPSON

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Pulskamp, Gregory; Comment: AFTER HEARING **MAILED 03/27/20**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: JUDGMENT FL-180**MAILED 03/24/2020 PER COURT CLOSURES**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: JUDGMENT FL-180 **RETURNED VIA MAIL**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial - Court Trial 10/18/2019: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial - Court Trial 09/06/2019: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Stipulated Continuance; Comment: RE: CHILD SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial - Court Trial 07/05/2019: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketTrial Brief

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: PRO PER New Attorney: F.L THOMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RETURNED TO FL THOMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: ENDORSED COPY OF ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketResponse - Comment: -MARRIAGE/DOMESTIC PARTNERSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketFamily Law Documents - Requested By: PELAYO, ALMA E; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less