This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 05:29:24 (UTC).

PEGGY BLANCHARD AS TRUSTEE OF THE PREWITT FAMILY TRUST VS REYNOLDS

Case Summary

On 07/20/2015 PEGGY BLANCHARD AS TRUSTEE OF THE PREWITT FAMILY TRUST filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against REYNOLDS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brumfield, Lorna H., Clark, Thomas S. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0473

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Clark, Thomas S.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEGGY BLANCHARD AS TRUSTEE OF THE PREWITT FAMILY TRUST

Defendant

REYNOLDS, REBECCA J.

Cross Plaintiff

REYNOLDS, REBECCA J

Cross Defendants

SERVICE TEAM OF PROFESSIONALS, A DIVISION OF TJK SERVICES INC

TJK SERVICES, INC

BLANCHARD, PEGGY

THE PREWITT FAMILY TRUST, PEGGY BLANCHARD TRUSTEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

MCQUILLEN, KASSANDRA

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LANDSGAARD, OLAF A

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 12/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CASE SETTLED AT MSC 8/18/17 (OSC CONT'D FROM 10/20/17 TO ALLOW PARTIES TO FINALIZE SETTLEMENT)

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE; DISMISSAL

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 10/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: Matter settled at 08/18/17 MSC

Motion to Bifurcate

Motion to Bifurcate 08/04/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: TRIAL

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: 1ST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ELECTRONICALLY SUBMITTED 12/09/16 IS DUPLICATE FILING. 1ST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT WAS FILED 12/06/16.

Motion to Amend (Post-Disposition)

**MO - motion to amend Public: Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 10/31/16 Defendant/Cross-Complainant, REBECCA J REYNOLDS Motion for Leave to File First Amended Cross-Complaint ResID: 18264

Further Case Management Conference

CMC MO 08/02/2016: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: TRIAL DATE TO BE SET; CONT'D FROM 05/24/16; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: MCQUILLEN, KASSANDRA

Further Case Management Conference

05/24/16 MO - FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: MCQUILLEN, KASSANDRA

Further Case Management Conference

**MO - Public further cmc: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FEES POSTED BY DEFENDANT; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: MCQUILLEN, KASSANDRA

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL; ITEM# 1.B FILING DATE DOES NOT CONFORM TO THE FIRST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT; ITEM# 1.B.6 PLEASE SPECIFY FIRST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT ALSO CROSS DEFENDANTS NAMES DO NOT CONFORM TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL; ITEM 1.(b)(3) NEEDS TO BE COMPLETED; ITEM 6 NEEDS TO SPECIFY AS TO ROE #103 PEGGY BLANCHARD.

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 08/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: SET PER STIPULATION AND ORDER DATED 8/4/17 (PARTIAL SETTLEMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFF/CROSS DEFENDANT PEGGY BLANCHARD AS TRUSTEE OF THE PREWITT FAMILY TRUST AND DEFENDANT/CROSS COMPLAINANT REBECCA J. REYNOLDS

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE; ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT RETURNED VIA; USPS

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 8/4/17: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: on declaration of Olaf Landsgaard

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 07/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FILED 7/18/17 MOVING PARTY; CROSS DEFENDANT TJK SERVICES EX PARTE TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR MOTION TO BIFURCATE TRIAL

Further Case Management Conference

**MO -further cmc Public: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: reason for cmc hearing: Mr Landsgaard to file motion

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 11/01/2016: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 08/02/2016; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: MCQUILLEN, KASSANDRA

Case Management Conference

**MO - Public cmc: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: MCQUILLEN, KASSANDRA

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Other Court-Ordered Dism Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketOrder Dismissing Action (Full) - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 12/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CASE SETTLED AT MSC 8/18/17 (OSC CONT'D FROM 10/20/17 TO ALLOW PARTIES TO FINALIZE SETTLEMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: WITH PREJUDICE AS TO TJK SERVICES INC; SERVICE TEAM OF PROFESSIONALS A DIVISION OF TJK SESRVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE; DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL; ITEM# 1.B FILING DATE DOES NOT CONFORM TO THE FIRST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT; ITEM# 1.B.6 PLEASE SPECIFY FIRST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT ALSO CROSS DEFENDANTS NAMES DO NOT CONFORM TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: & final case management conference set con-current. estimate 5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 10/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: Matter settled at 08/18/17 MSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketJudgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: FOR CROSS COMPLAINANT REBECCA J. REYNOLDS AND AGAINST THE PREWITT FAMILY TRUST PEGGY BLANCHARD TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY REBECCA J. REYNOLDS ON 12/09/16; WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT ROE#103 PEGGY BLANCHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketAnswer to Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketSummons on Cross-Complaint Issued - Comment: and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketNotice of Ruling - Comment: on Defendants/Cross-Complaint, Rebecca J Reynolds's Motion to Reclassify and Transfer Case to Civil Unlimited Based on the Cross-Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketReclassification - Transfer In - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: Proof of Service Hearing Date: 11/02/15 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketAnswer to Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketCross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Olaf Arthur Landsgaard. Isq. ‘ CILE .aw Offices of Olafl LLandsgaard AUPERIGRROURT ME: P.O. Box 2567. 4171 Knox Avcnue | CUNTY Rosamond. CA 93560

661-256-9271 AUG/ 2 201/

661-256-9212 I'ax Statc Bar No.: 125747 TERRY McNALLY, CLERK

BY DEPUTY

Attorney for Defendant and Cross-Complainant

SUPLRIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA. COUNTY OIF KERN

KERN COUNTY - BAKERSIFIELD COURT

PEGGY BLANCIHARD. AS TRUSTEE OIF ) Case No.: BCV-15-100473 THE PREWITT FAMILY TRUST. ) . ) [Assigned 1o for All Purposes 1o the Hon. Plaintiff ; Thomas S. Clark. Dept. 7] ) \S. ) DEFENDANT AND CROSS-

) COMPLAINANT’S ANSWERTO

1 . . . ) PEGGY BLANCHARD’S CROSS- REBECCA J. REYNOLDS. and DOLES 1-10. ) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY

) RELIEF

) Defendant. ) 3 ) Cross-Complainant. ; ) Vs, ) ) THE PREWITT FAMILY TRUST. PEGGY ) BLANCHARD. TRUSTEE: PEGGY ; BLANCIHARD: TIK SERVICES. INC.: ) SERVICE TEAM OF PROFESSIONALS.a ) division of TIK SERVICES. INC.: and ROES ) 101-150. ; (f_mss-Dc('cndants_. )

TO: ALL PARTIES AND THEIR COUNSEL OF RECORD: REBLECCA I. REYNOLDS. Dcfendant and Cross-Complainant. hereby answers

the cross-complaint filed by Peggy Blanchard. an individual. as follows: