This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 21:48:56 (UTC).

PECSI ET AL VS COUNTY OF KERN ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/08/2017 PECSI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COUNTY OF KERN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0480

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PECSI, LOREN

PECSI, RAYMOND

Defendants

COUNTY OF KERN

KERN COUNTY SOCCER FOUNDATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OWEN, SUSAN A

Defendant Attorneys

DORRIS, ASHLEY ANN

CHENIER, MAURICE L.

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Request for Dismissal: 2nd Rejection Duplicate filing received, Request for dismissal received and processed 5/16/2019.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Request for Dismissal: Duplicate filing received,Request for dismissal received and processed 5/16/2019.

Ruling

Ruling 04/03/2019: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 07/27/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: 2nd rejection. Attorney Maurice Chenier has filed a notice of change of address with our court. The address information on item #2 c. does not match our records. Please make corrections and re-submit.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Attorney, Maurice Chenier, address information does not match our records. Please make corrections and re-submit. Returned via efile

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 6/21/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: T/E 8 DAYS JURY FOR ALL PARITES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: J/T & FSC SET 8/12/19 9AM DEPT 11 T/E 8 DAYS JURY FOR ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Request for Dismissal: 2nd Rejection Duplicate filing received, Request for dismissal received and processed 5/16/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Request for Dismissal: Duplicate filing received,Request for dismissal received and processed 5/16/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Re: 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With Prejudice as to Entire Action of All Parties and All Causes of Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Unconditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 04/03/2019: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: Defendants' Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Defendants' Answer to Plaintiffs' Unverified Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 06/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 07/10/2017; Served: 04/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 6/21/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less