This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2020 at 14:27:11 (UTC).

PCC VS POLANCO

Case Summary

On 05/05/2003 PCC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against POLANCO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4099

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS

Defendant

POLANCO, RICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

WU, SCOTT D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2010
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: COUNTY: KERN ISSUED: 8/3/06 DEFICIT: $1,882.81

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2006
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction - Comment: COUNTY: KERN DATE OF RECORDING: 9/18/06 INSTRUMENT #: 0203198986

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2006
  • Docket115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 - Comment: Amount of $15.00 for PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS (PL-1). Received from PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION, check no(s) 54819. Receipt #258707 for amount of $15.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2006
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: SACRAMENTO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2006
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2003
  • Docket117 Pmt: Abstract Issued / GC 26834 - Comment: Amount of $7.00 for PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS (PL-1). Received from PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION, check no(s) 22633. Receipt #44739 for amount of $7.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2003
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Comment: SIGNED BY JUDGE CRAIG PHILLIPS. JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST RICK POLANCO @ $1110.44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2003
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DOES 1 TO 10 RECEIVED AND ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2003
  • DocketOrder - Comment: FOR JUDGMENT @ 1110.44 AGAINST RICK POLANCO SIGNED BY JUDGE CRAIG PHILLIPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2003
  • DocketOrder - Comment: FOR ATTORNEY FEES RECEIVED AND SIGNED BY JUDGE CRAIG PHILLIPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2003
  • DocketOrder - Comment: PERMITTING COPIES RECEIVED AND SIGNED BY JUDGE CRAIG PHILLIPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2003
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: PURSUANT TO CCP 585.5 FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2003
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 585.5; EVIDENCE CODE 1531, 1550, 1551 FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2003
  • DocketOrder - Comment: AUTHORIZING COSTS RECEIVED AND SIGNED BY JUDGE CRAIG PHILLIPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2003
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: UNDER CCP 1033 RE: LETTER ADVISING OF SUPERIOR COURT FILING; ORDER AUTHORIZING COST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2003
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT FILED BY SCOTT WU, COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2003
  • DocketDefault Entered as Requested On - Comment: DATE: 07/14/03 PARTY: RICK POLANCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2003
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default - Comment: RE RICK POLANCO.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2003
  • DocketSee Civil Management Register of Actions for Events Prior to - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2003
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 238

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WU SCOTT D.