This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 16:44:25 (UTC).

PAYNE VS WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 06/10/2015 PAYNE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillips, Craig G. and Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0016

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Phillips, Craig G.

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAYNE, KENNETH E

PAYNE, KENNETH

Defendant

WILLIAMS, TONYA M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: PAYNE, KENNETH; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 523 Lucard St Taft, CA 93268; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against: WILLIAMS, TONYA M; Party: Names: PAYNE, KENNETH E; WILLIAMS, TONYA M; PAYNE, KENNETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: Property: 523 Lucard St. Taft, CA 93268/Returned Original via In Pro Per Bin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: As to Tonya M Williams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: by posting as to Tonya M. Williams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Declaration and Order to Post Filed - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PAYNE, KENNETH E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 523 LUCARD ST TAFT, CA 93268 KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Comment: Returned VIA In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less