This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:48:17 (UTC).

PATRIOT VILLAGE II HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS WALKER

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 PATRIOT VILLAGE II HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WALKER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S., Holladay, Brandon and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1813

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Holladay, Brandon

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATRIOT VILLAGE II HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendant

WALKER, MILDRED IRENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITTINGTON, MICHAEL T

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference / Order to Show Cause 10/04/2017: Judicial Officer: Holladay, Brandon; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 07/24/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: WHITTINGTON, MICHAEL T

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: re: Dismissal and re: imposition of additional sanctions to Plaintiff's counsel for failure to comply with CRC Rule 3.110 and failing to appear at the Order to Show Cause hearing heard on 10/04/2017. **CMC ALSO ON CAL**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketOrder to Appear and Order to Show Cause - Comment: 12/7/17, 830am, Dept 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Case Management Conference / Order to Show Cause 10/04/2017: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110: Judicial Officer: Holladay, Brandon; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 07/24/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference / Order to Show Cause 10/04/2017: Judicial Officer: Holladay, Brandon; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 07/24/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/24/17 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less