This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:48:21 (UTC).

PATRIOT VILLAGE II HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS KIMBLE

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 PATRIOT VILLAGE II HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KIMBLE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Holladay, Brandon. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1814

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Holladay, Brandon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATRIOT VILLAGE II HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendant

KIMBLE, LESLIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITTINGTON, MICHAEL T

 

Court Documents

Debtor's Examination

Debtor's Examination 12/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: AS TO LESLIE KIMBLE; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: WHITTINGTON, MICHAEL T

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketAttachment for Defaulters / Bench Warrant Returned - Comment: warrant expired

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketAmended Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO LESLIE KIMBLE / OEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDebtor's Examination - Debtor's Examination 12/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: AS TO LESLIE KIMBLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO LESLIE KIMBLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: AS TO LESLIE KIMBLE Hearing Date: 12/14/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Holladay, Brandon; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: PATRIOT VILLAGE II HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION; Awarded Against: KIMBLE, LESLIE; Amount; Damages: $2,170.00; Attorney Fees: $434.00; Costs: $255.00; Total: $2859.00; Party: Names: PATRIOT VILLAGE II HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION; KIMBLE, LESLIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: Against Leslie Kimble

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied / Incomplete - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: DENIED BY COMMISSIONER **ETIENNE** AS TO LESLIE KIMBLE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: AS TO LESLIE KIMBLE (STRICKEN 6/12/17)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO LESLIE KIMBLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO LESLIE KIMBLE, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 04/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/24/17 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less