This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 13:37:38 (UTC).

PATEL VS CHANDNI CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/11/2015 PATEL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CHANDNI CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Chapin, Sidney P.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1673

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Chapin, Sidney P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PATEL, CHANDNI

PATEL, JAYA

Defendant

CHANDNI CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDERSON, MICHAEL D

Defendant Attorneys

OTTEN, VICTOR J

DODGIN, DUSTIN S

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 01/22/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: DODGIN, DUSTIN S

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 11/13/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Pursuant to CRC rule 3.1385; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: DODGIN, DUSTIN S

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 09/22/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Special setting; Case settled with related case S-1500CV283711.; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: DODGIN, DUSTIN S

Ruling

Ruling 08/17/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 11:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Jury Trial

Jury Trial 05/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: counsel to return at 9:15 a.m., jury to return at 9:30 a.m; Parties Present Plaintiff: PATEL, JAYA; Attorney: ANDERSON, MICHAEL D; Defendant; Attorney: DODGIN, DUSTIN S; Plaintiff: PATEL, CHANDNI; Attorney: ANDERSON, MICHAEL D

Jury Trial

Jury Trial 04/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: PATEL, JAYA; Attorney: ANDERSON, MICHAEL D; Defendant; Attorney: DODGIN, DUSTIN S; Plaintiff: PATEL, CHANDNI; Attorney: ANDERSON, MICHAEL D

Final Case Management Conference

Final Case Management Conference 04/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: t/e 3 days bench triaL date 04/24/2017 (jury waived by Plaintiff) (jury requested by Defendant but failed to post fees); Parties Present Plaintiff: PATEL, JAYA; Attorney: ANDERSON, MICHAEL D; Defendant; Attorney: DODGIN, DUSTIN S; Plaintiff; Attorney: ANDERSON, MICHAEL D

Ruling

Ruling 04/14/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

06/08/2016 Minute Order: Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 12/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: (continued from 11/13/2017); Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: DODGIN, DUSTIN S

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Stipulation is not needed. Resolved by Minute Order dated 8-17-17

Ruling

Ruling 07/20/2017: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: Ruling on Court trial (submitted on 5/26/17); jw

Court Trial

Court Trial 05/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Court Trial on Factual Issues Remaining; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: DODGIN, DUSTIN S

Court Trial

Court Trial 05/12/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: (as to third and fourth causes of action); Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: DODGIN, DUSTIN S

Jury Trial

Jury Trial 05/02/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: PATEL, JAYA; Attorney: ANDERSON, MICHAEL D; Defendant; Attorney: DODGIN, DUSTIN S; Plaintiff: PATEL, CHANDNI; Attorney: ANDERSON, MICHAEL D

Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition)

Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition) 04/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 3-27-17 Defendant Chandni Corporation Motion to be Relieved from Waiver of Right to Trial; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: DODGIN, DUSTIN S

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 03/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: filing date: 3-24-17 moving party: defendant Chandi Corporation Ex parte Application for an order shortening time for an order shortening time on hearing for motion to be relieved from waiver of right to trial

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Dustin S Dodgin Re: Notice of posting jury fees Reason: Pursuant to Honorable David R Lampe:By Statute, jury is waived if not paid before first case management conference. Now, leave of court is required

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: continued from 1/22/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 01/22/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 12/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: (continued from 11/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 11/13/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Pursuant to CRC rule 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketExhibit(s) List - Comment: PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Minute Order Dated 10-2-17: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Mandatory Settlement Conference 09/22/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Special setting; Case settled with related case S-1500CV283711.

    Read MoreRead Less
126 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: and Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 01/24/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: BY MAIL, AS TO, CHANDNI CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. 01/25/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: SUBSTITUTED, AS TO, CHANDNI CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. 01/24/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT. RETURNED VIA MAIL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 3/25/16 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.